Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978445

EP0978445 - Mudguard [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evans, Peter Robert
4 Hengrave Close Ipswich
Suffolk IP2 9DG / GB
For all designated states
Jones, Paul Anthony
4 Hengrave Close Ipswich
Suffolk IP2 9DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
Evans, Peter Robert
4 Hengrave Close
Ipswich, Suffolk IP2 9DG / GB
For all designated states
Jones, Paul Anthony
4 Hengrave Close
Ipswich, Suffolk IP2 9DG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Evans, Peter Robert
4 Hengrave Close
Ipswich, Suffolk IP2 9DG / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Copp, David Christopher , et al
Dummett Copp 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL
Suffolk / GB
[2008/37]
Former [2000/06]Copp, David Christopher , et al
Dummett Copp, 25 The Square, Martlesham Heath
Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB
Application number, filing date99306056.530.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateGB1998001684301.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9816843
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978445
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978445
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B62J13/00, B62J15/00
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Schutzblech[2000/06]
English:Mudguard[2000/06]
French:Garde-boue[2000/06]
Examination procedure03.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/22]
13.10.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.02.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/27]
08.02.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XA]DE4126156  (EDER MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure -; claim - * [A] 4;
 [X]US5067930  (MORALES ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [X]US4515386  (TSUJIMURA KANJI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2751935  (SAVOY ENSEIGNE [FR]) [A] 3,7,8 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO9625319  (HARDING EDWARD JAMES [GB]) [A] 1-7 * figure -; claims 1,2 *