Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978835

EP0978835 - Retrieval of serpentine pattern data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  07.08.2009
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 09.09.2009  [2009/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, NY 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fry, Scott Milton
c/o IBM U.K.Ltd. Int.Prop.Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
02 / Johnson, Steven Douglas
c/o IBM U.K.Ltd. Int.Prop.Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
03 / Wilson, Steven Bennett
c/o IBM U.K.Ltd. Int.Prop.Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Boyce, Conor
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester
Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Boyce, Conor
IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
Application number, filing date99306064.930.07.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1998012873705.08.1998         Original published format: US 128737
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978835
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978835
Date:20.10.2004
[2004/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2004
ClassificationInternational:G11B15/05, G11B15/00, G11B15/68, G11B15/67, G11B23/04
[2000/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/06]
TitleGerman:Wiederauffindung von Daten mit schlangenförmigemmuster[2000/06]
English:Retrieval of serpentine pattern data[2000/06]
French:Récupération de données à configuration en serpentin[2000/06]
Examination procedure12.11.2004Examination requested  [2005/02]
14.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/37]
12.03.2009Date of oral proceedings
21.04.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/37]
21.04.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.07.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
18.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9702566  (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,9 * the whole document *;
 []US5852534  (OZUE TADASHI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 2, line 36 - line 41 * * column 11, line 33 - line 35 * * column 13 - column 16 * * column 18, line 45 - line 67 *;
 [A]WO9745837  (QUANTUM CORP [US]) [A] 6-8,10,11 * pages 2,3,5; figure 4 *;
 [X]  HP, IBM, SEAGATE, "Linear Tape - Open (LTO) Technology White Paper", INTERNET ARTICLE, (199804), pages 1 - 9, URL: http://www.storageheaven.com/downloads/ultrium.pdf, (20040825), XP002293942 [X] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [A]  W E WILLIAMS, "DLT technology overview : A survey of general technology and design features", IIE, (19961227), URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/iel3/4720/13144/00603015.pdf?isNumber=13144&prod=STD&arnumber=603015&arSt=5%2F1&ared=5%2F5&arAuthor=Williams%2C+W.E., (20040825), XP002293943 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [AL]  ROGER POZAK, "Tape Drive Technology Comparison : Sony AIT . Exabyte Mammoth . Quantum DLT", INTERNET ARTICLE, (199904), URL: www.qualstar.com/tapetechcomp.pdf, (20040825), XP002293944 [AL] 1-11 * the whole document *