Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980137

EP0980137 - Synchronous pilot detection technique for a control system that reduces distortion produced by electrical circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.05.2001
Database last updated on 22.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.05.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.07.2001 [2001/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Myer, Robert Evan
30 Spear Lane
Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green
Essex IG8 0TU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99306118.302.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013305412.08.1998         Original published format: US 133054
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980137
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/32
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Synchrone Pilottondetektiontechnik für Steuerungssystem zur Reduzierung der durch elektrische Schaltungen erzeugten Entzerrung[2000/07]
English:Synchronous pilot detection technique for a control system that reduces distortion produced by electrical circuits[2000/07]
French:Technique de détection synchrone d' un signal pilote pour un système de commande qui réduit la distortion produite par des circuits électriques[2000/07]
Examination procedure02.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
12.05.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/27]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0803974  (POWERWAVE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [X]US5565814  (FUKUCHI AKIO [JP]) [X] 1-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5477187  (KOBAYASHI FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * column W *;
 [X]US5307022  (TATTERSALL JR DEREK L [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * column W *