Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979609

EP0979609 - Novel method for producing food product of wheat having improved quality and preservability [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daiwa Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
7-12, Uehonmachi 5-chome, Tennouji-ku
Osaka 543-0001 / JP
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Hidaki, Yumiko
253-4, Nishidera, Ishibe-cho
Koka-gun, Shiga-ken / JP
02 / Tani, Hirokazu
311-31, Sano, Notogawa-cho
Kanzaki-gun, Shiga-ken / JP
03 / Shimizu, Yasuhiro
741-43, Nakayabu-cho, Hikone-shi
Shiga-ken / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
7th Floor
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/01]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales
Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Former [2000/07]Austin, Hedley William
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date99306144.904.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022622510.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22622598
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979609
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979609
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:A21D8/04, A23L1/105, A23L1/03
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   FR,   IT [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Neues Verfahren zur Herstellung von Weizennahrungsmitteln mit Qualitäts- und Haltbarkeitsverbesserung[2000/07]
English:Novel method for producing food product of wheat having improved quality and preservability[2000/07]
French:Nouvelle méthode pour produire des produits alimentaires à base de blé ayant une qualité et une conservation améliorées[2000/07]
Examination procedure10.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
16.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
30.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
09.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2002Fee for grant paid
11.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
28.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
28.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US4522832  (MORRISON BRADLEY W [CA]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 17 * * examples I,II * * claim 1 *;
 [X]JPH04207143  ;
 [X]DE2511847  (FRANKEN ZUCKERFAB) [X] 1,2,8 * claim 1 *;
 [A]US4237230  (IIDA TAKAO, et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, lines 60-64 * * column 5, lines 52-61 * * claim 3 *
 [X]  - DROBOT V I ET AL, "Use of.Nb-galactosidase for treating dried skim milk in baking.", DATABASE FSTA, INTERNATIONAL FOOD INFORMATION SERVICE (IFIS), FRANFURT/MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 83-4-08-p1257, XP002123183 [X] 1,2,7-9 * abstract *
    [] - PISHCHEVAYA PROMYSHLENNOST', KTIPP, USSR, (1982),
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921113), vol. 016, no. 544, Database accession no. (C - 1004), [X] 1-3,6,8 * abstract *