Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978827

EP0978827 - Information recording method, information recording medium and information recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]For all designated states
HITACHI, LTD.
6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Maeda, Takeshi
5-4, Honcho-4-chome
Kokubunji-shi / JP
02 / Sukeda, Hirofumi
16-17, Higashitokorozawawada-1-chome
Tokorozawa-shi / JP
03 / Minemura, Hiroyuki
3-2-201, Higashikoigakubo-4-chome
Kokubunji-shi / JP
04 / Kando, Hidehiko
1292-1-901, Matsudo
Matsudo-shi / JP
05 / Miyamoto, Makoto
577-3-307, Chigasemachi-4-chome
Ome-shi / JP
[2000/06]
Representative(s)Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/06]Calderbank, Thomas Roger , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99306165.403.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateJP1998022009704.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22009798
JP1998024674401.09.1998         Original published format: JP 24674498
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978827
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978827
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11B7/125, G11B7/00
[2001/02]
Former International [2000/06]G11B7/125
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2001/39]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Informationsaufzeichnungsverfahren, Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium, und Informationsaufzeichnungsgerät[2000/06]
English:Information recording method, information recording medium and information recording apparatus[2000/06]
French:Procédé d'enregistrement d'informations, support d'enregistrement d'informations, et dispositif d'enregistrement d'informations[2000/06]
Examination procedure23.08.1999Examination requested  [2000/06]
01.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/47]
30.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/47]
Divisional application(s)EP08013971.0  / EP2015300
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
24.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
22.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
21.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5642343  (TODA TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 25, line 11 - column 25, line 46 *;
 [A]EP0797193  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 7, line 3 - page 8, line 34 * * page 23, line 20 - page 33, line 2 *;
 [A]US5499227  (HIGASA MASASHI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 38 *;
 [A]WO9730440  (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 5, line 19 - page 11, line 20 *;
 [A]US5703855  (KIRINO FUMIYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * column 18, line 25 - column 21, line 62 *;
 [E]EP0933759  (SONY CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2 * abstract * * page 2, line 10 - line 20; figure 1 * * page 4, line 39 - page 5, line 29; figures 6A-6H *