Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0978707

EP0978707 - Methods and apparatus for selecting a destination in a vehicle navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2007
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.06.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.07.2007  [2007/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visteon Technologies, LLC
5500 Auto Club Drive
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
[2000/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Kadaba, Sudha G.
520 Mansion Court, No. 105
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
02 / Ishikawa, Naruaki
6-23 Midori-cho No A205
Higashimatsuyama-shi, Saitama, 355-0027 / JP
[2000/32]
Former [2000/06]01 / Kadaba, Sudha G.
520 Mansion Court, No. 105
Santa Clara, California 95054 / US
02 / Ishikawa, Naruaki
180 Elm Court, No. 1607
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/26]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn
London WC1V 7HU / GB
Former [2000/06]Orchard, Oliver John
JOHN ORCHARD & CO. Staple Inn Buildings North High Holborn
London WC1V 7PZ / GB
Application number, filing date99306199.304.08.1999
[2000/06]
Priority number, dateUS1998013104505.08.1998         Original published format: US 131045
[2000/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0978707
Date:09.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0978707
Date:11.04.2001
[2001/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0978707
Date:02.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/20, G01C21/36, G06F3/023
[2001/15]
Former International [2000/06]G01C21/20
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/01]
Former [2000/06]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Selektieren eines Zielorts in einem Fahrzeugnavigationssystem[2000/06]
English:Methods and apparatus for selecting a destination in a vehicle navigation system[2000/06]
French:Méthodes et appareil pour sélectionner une destination dans un système de navigation véhiculaire[2000/06]
Examination procedure28.09.2001Examination requested  [2001/49]
25.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2006Fee for grant paid
11.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.05.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
04.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5377113  (SHIBAZAKI MASAMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,19,20 * column 3, line 61 - column 4, line 30; figure 3 *;
 [Y]US5059965  (GEISER GEORG [DE]) [Y] 1,19,20 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 8; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5072395  (BLISS HARRY M [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, line 14 - line 38; figure - *;
 [DA]EP0790593  (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *