blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980057

EP0980057 - Vibrating apparatus and simulator apparatus using vibrating apparatus and an actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.07.2015
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.08.2015  [2015/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-20-8, Ebisu
Shibuya-ku
Tokyo 150-8554 / JP
For all designated states
THK CO. LTD.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
[2014/46]
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
THK CO. LTD.
11-6, Nishi Gotanda 3-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 141 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nozawa, Masatsugu, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K. Kaisha
7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 160-0023 / JP
02 / Kawaguchi, Takahiro, c/o THK Kabushiki Kaisha
11-6 Nishigotanda 3-chome, Shingawa-ku
Tokyo 141-0031 / JP
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Brookes IP
Windsor House
6-10 Mount Ephraim Road
Tunbridge Wells, Kent TN1 1EE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]Brookes Batchellor LLP
102-108 Clerkenwell Road London
EC1M 5SA / GB
Former [2000/07]Kemp, Paul Geoffrey
Batchellor, Kirk & Co., 102-108 Clerkenwell Road
London EC1M 5SA / GB
Application number, filing date99306234.805.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateJP1998022617510.08.1998         Original published format: JP 22617598
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980057
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G09B9/04, G09B9/12
[2000/07]
CPC:
G09B9/04 (EP,US); G09B9/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesGB [2000/44]
Former [2000/07]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vibrationsgerät und von diesem Gebrauch machender Simulator sowie Betätigungsvorrichtung[2000/07]
English:Vibrating apparatus and simulator apparatus using vibrating apparatus and an actuator[2000/07]
French:Appareil vibratoire et simulateur utilisant cet appareil et un actionneur[2000/07]
Examination procedure10.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
17.08.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
23.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
16.06.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2010Invitation to provide information on prior art
02.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2011Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art
03.03.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/32]
27.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2015/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2005
Request for further processing for:16.06.2006Request for further processing filed
16.06.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.07.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
17.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
15.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 13
20.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
13.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
18.09.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
18.09.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201416   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5575597  (BAILEY RALPH P S [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * column 14, line 61 - column 18, line 11; figures 23-26D *;
 [A]US5444348  (GARREC PHILIPPE [FR]) [A] 1,2,4,9,10 * column 6, line 30 - column 6, line 42; figure 3 *;
 [A]FR2739428  (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5453011  (FEUER EDUARD [US], et al) [A] 1,4-6,9 * column 3, line 21 - column 3, line 43; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP0432118  (SANDVIK SPECIAL METALS [US]) [A] 1,2,4,7-10 * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 2; figures 3,6,7 *
by applicantGB1160471
 US5433670
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.