Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980155

EP0980155 - Method and apparatus for monitoring dispersive-wave energy to optimize soliton transmission performance [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cisco Photonics Italy SrL
Viale Sarca, 222
20126 Milan / IT
[2003/35]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.p.A.
Viale Sarca, 222
20126 Milano / IT
Former [2000/07]For all designated states
Pirelli Cables and Systems LLC
710 Industrial Drive
Lexington, South Carolina 29072-3755 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Saunders, Ross Alexander
7 Willow Grove
Dunfermline, Fife KY11 5BB, Scotland / GB
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/07]Abbie, Andrew Kenneth , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99306259.506.08.1999
[2000/07]
Priority number, dateUS1998013201410.08.1998         Original published format: US 132014
[2000/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980155
Date:16.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980155
Date:29.10.2003
Language:EN
[2003/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04B10/18, H04B10/08
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Überwachung von dispersiver Wellenenergie zum optimieren der Solitonübertragungsleistung[2000/07]
English:Method and apparatus for monitoring dispersive-wave energy to optimize soliton transmission performance[2000/07]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour surveiller l'énergie d'ondes dispersives afin d'optimiser la performance de transmission de solitons[2000/07]
Examination procedure14.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
10.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
31.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
22.07.2003Fee for grant paid
22.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43]
Request for further processing for:22.07.2003Request for further processing filed
22.07.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.08.2003Decision despatched
17.12.2002Request for further processing filed
12.12.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.01.2003Decision despatched
10.08.2001Request for further processing filed
10.08.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.10.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
PT29.03.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
CY29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/52]AT29.10.2003
BE29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/46]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
ES09.02.2004
Former [2004/33]AT29.10.2003
CH29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
LI29.10.2003
GR29.01.2004
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT29.10.2003
FI29.10.2003
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/26]FI29.10.2003
SE29.01.2004
Former [2004/24]SE29.01.2004
Documents cited:Search[AD]  ESSIAMBRE R -J ET AL, "CONTROL OF SOLITON-SOLITON AND SOLITON-DISPERSIVE WAVE INTERACTIONS IN HIGH BIT-RATE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (19950817), vol. 31, no. 17, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1461 - 1463, XP000528981 [AD] 1,11,18 * abstract * * page 1461, column R, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19950973
 [A]  MASAYUKI MATSUMOTO ET AL, "SUPPRESSION OF NOISE ACCUMULATION IN BANDWIDTH-LIMITED SOLITON TRANSMISSION BY MEANS OF NONLINEAR LOOP MIRRORS", OPTICS LETTERS, (19940201), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 183 - 185, XP000424360 [A] 1,11,18 * abstract * * page 183, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 185, column R, paragraph 2 *