EP0980083 - Variable resistance switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2004 [2004/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 West Boulevard North Elkhart, Indiana 46514-1899 / US | [2000/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Black, Richard L. 14468 Meadow Run Court, Granger St. Joseph, IN 46530 / US | 02 /
Kurtz, Kevin D. 10112 Calverton Pass Ft. Wayne, Allen, IN 46825 / US | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven Patents & Trademarks West Central Runcorn Road Lincoln LN6 3QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | Loven, Keith James, et al Loven & Co Quantum House 30 Tentercroft Street Lincoln LN5 7DB / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306329.6 | 11.08.1999 | [2000/07] | Priority number, date | US19980132798 | 13.08.1998 Original published format: US 132798 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0980083 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0980083 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | [2001/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/02, H01C10/36, H01C10/50 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
H01C10/50 (EP,US);
H01H1/5805 (EP,US);
H01H15/102 (EP,US);
H01H3/0213 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/07] | H01H3/02, H01C10/36 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/46] |
Former [2000/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schalter mit veränderlichem Widerstand | [2000/07] | English: | Variable resistance switch | [2000/07] | French: | Commutateur à résistance variable | [2000/07] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2001 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 12.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/53] | 27.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1074498 (BUSCH JAEGER LU DENSCHEIDER ME) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]US4117445 (FOREMAN LUTHER M, et al) [Y] 2-9 * column 5, lines 1-43; figure 6; claim 7 *; | [XA]US3746923 (SPIRA J, et al) [X] 1 * figure 7 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]US4104606 (DEWITT ROBERT R) [X] 1 * figure 12 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]US3381254 (CAMPBELL DUDLEY H) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 * [A] 2-9 |