Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994304

EP0994304 - Thermally compliant liner [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.10.2006  [2006/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Brewer, Keith S.
1939 Ridge Road
North Palm Beach, FL 33408 / US
02 / Olsen, David R.
1487 Windship Circle
Wellington, FL 33414 / US
03 / Chaplin, Gary F.
38 Cayman Place
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Leckey, David Herbert
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99306363.512.08.1999
[2000/16]
Priority number, dateUS1998017302015.10.1998         Original published format: US 173020
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0994304
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0994304
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994304
Date:09.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:F23R3/00, F02K1/82, F02K1/80
[2002/01]
Former International [2000/16]F23R3/00, F02K1/82
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/38]
Former [2000/16]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Wärmebewegliche Auskleidung[2000/16]
English:Thermally compliant liner[2000/16]
French:Garniture thermo-mobile[2000/16]
Examination procedure14.01.2002Examination requested  [2002/13]
04.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.09.2005Fee for grant paid
06.09.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2271405  (SNECMA [FR]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2544538  (MAHNKEN WALTER W, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 39 - line 54; figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]GB901044  (ZD Y V I PLZEN);
 [A]US4864818  (TAYLOR JAMES J [US]);
 [A]US2722801  (ALBERT LOMBARD ADRIAN)