Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980807

EP0980807 - Braking system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dunlop Aerospace Limited
Holbrook Lane
Coventry, CV6 4AA / GB
[2000/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Bartram, Michael James
86 Kingsbridge Road Nuneaton
Warwickshire CV10 0DB / GB
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
Avidity IP
Kestrel House
Falconry Court
Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Former [2007/46]Moore, Christopher Mark , et al
HLBBshaw 10th Floor 1 Hagley Road
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
Former [2005/16]Symons, Rupert Jonathan
HLBBshaw, 10th Floor 1 Hagley Road
Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
Former [2000/08]Shaw, Laurence
Laurence Shaw & Associates, 5th Floor Metropolitan House, 1 Hagley Road
Edgbaston, Birmingham B16 8TG / GB
Application number, filing date99306403.913.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateGB1998001775715.08.1998         Original published format: GB 9817757
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980807
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980807
Date:19.03.2003
[2003/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.02.2003
ClassificationInternational:B60T13/66
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:Bremssystem[2000/08]
English:Braking system[2000/08]
French:Système de freinage[2000/08]
Examination procedure16.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
12.11.2003Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/32]
20.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
19.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
26.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
04.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
27.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0928740  (MESSIER BUGATTI [FR]) [PX] 1,3,4,10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0022] , [0035] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0526882  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 53 - line 54; figure 1 * * column 7, line 15 - line 24 * * column 8, line 14 - line 34 * * column 8, line 56 - line 58 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9420344  (DUNLOP LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 7 *;
 [A]EP0384071  (AIRCRAFT BRAKING SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * column 6, line 30 - line 39 * * column 7, line 40 - line 44 * * column 9, line 2 - line 4 *;
 [A]EP0443213  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 6 - page 7 * * figures 1,2 * * Abstract *;
 [AD]US4986610  (BECK ARNOLD A [US], et al) [AD] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]GB2216209  (DUNLOP LTD [GB]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 *