blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0980962

EP0980962 - High stiffness airoil and method of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.09.2003  [2003/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Allison Advanced Development Company
P.O. Box 7182
Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US
For all designated states
Rolls-Royce Corporation
P.O. Box 420
Indianapolis, IN 46206-0420 / US
[2002/23]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Allison Advanced Development Company
P.O. Box 7182
Indianapolis, IN 46206 / US
For all designated states
ALLISON ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
P.O. Box 420
Indianapolis, Indiana 46206-0420 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ress, Robert Anthony Jr.
218 West Admiral Way
Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US
02 / King, Brian Paul
79 Ridge Court
Greenwood, Indiana 46142 / US
03 / Ewing, Bruce Allan
1926 Foxcliff N.
Martinsville, Indiana 46151 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
1 New York Street
Manchester, M1 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Holmes, Matthew Peter, et al
MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street
Manchester M2 3LG / GB
Application number, filing date99306441.916.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998013439214.08.1998         Original published format: US 134392
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0980962
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0980962
Date:31.10.2001
[2001/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2001
ClassificationIPC:F01D5/28, F01D5/14
[2001/44]
CPC:
F01D5/28 (EP,US); F01D5/147 (EP,US); F05D2240/80 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2000/08]F01D5/28
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/29]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Versteiftes Schaufelblatt und dessen Herstellung[2000/08]
English:High stiffness airoil and method of manufacture[2000/08]
French:Aube renforcée et sa méthode de production[2000/08]
Examination procedure24.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/26]
03.05.2002Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.05.2002Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.08.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.09.2002Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
20.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/36]
01.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
10.06.2002AT   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002BE   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002CH   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002CY   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002DK   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002ES   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002FI   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002GR   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002IE   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002LU   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002MC   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002NL   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002PT   M01   Not yet paid
10.06.2002SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5439750  (RAVENHALL RICHARD [US], et al) [X] 1-42 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 17; figures 1,3,4; claims 1,4,5,15 * * column 2, line 43 - line 53 * * column 3, line 16 - line 56 * * column 4, line 54 - line 66 * * column 5, line 15 - line 40 * * column 6, line 20 - line 31 *;
 [X]US4314007  (GESSINGER GERNOT) [X] 1-5,18 * column 1, line 46 - line 54; figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 5 - line 62 *;
 [X]US2836391  (HAYES JOHN R) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 42 - line 50; figure - * * column 2, line 7 - line 40 *;
 [A]US5429877  (EYLON DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-3,5,7-18,20,23,25,26,28 * column 1, line 13 - line 55 * * column 2, line 29 - line 60 * * column 3, line 3 - line 8 *;
 [A]US3279006  (SCHWARTZ CHARLES W, et al) [A] 1-7,11 * column 1, line 30 - line 46 * * column 2, line 27 - line 36 * * column 9, line 6 - line 62 *;
 [A]US5634992  (KELLY THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 9,10,20,28,32 * column 1, line 21 - line 29 *;
 [A]EP0850718  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 14 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 6 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.