Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984083

EP0984083 - Omega spray pattern and method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2009
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 02.11.2011  [2011/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illinois Tool Works Inc.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, IL 60026 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County
Illinois 60025 / US
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC.
3600 West Lake Avenue
Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kwok, Kui-Chiu
655 Woodhaven Drive
Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/45]Finnie, Peter John , et al
Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Former [2000/10]Rackham, Stephen Neil
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99306461.717.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateUS1998014388331.08.1998         Original published format: US 143883
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984083
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984083
Date:19.04.2000
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984083
Date:22.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:D01D5/098, D01D4/02, D04H1/56
[2000/16]
Former International [2000/10]D01D5/098
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/10]
TitleGerman:Flüssigkeitstrahl zur Herstellung eines omega Motivs und Verfahren dafür[2000/10]
English:Omega spray pattern and method therefor[2000/10]
French:Jet liquide pour créer un oméga motif et procédé correspondant[2000/10]
Examination procedure19.09.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
20.03.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2008Fee for grant paid
09.07.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
19.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.10.2008
DK22.10.2008
FI22.10.2008
NL22.10.2008
SE22.01.2009
GR23.01.2009
PT23.03.2009
[2011/44]
Former [2011/25]DK22.10.2008
FI22.10.2008
NL22.10.2008
SE22.01.2009
GR23.01.2009
PT23.03.2009
Former [2010/06]DK22.10.2008
FI22.10.2008
NL22.10.2008
SE22.01.2009
PT23.03.2009
Former [2009/30]FI22.10.2008
NL22.10.2008
PT23.03.2009
Documents cited:Search[DPA]EP0872580  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [DPA] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0835952  (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9207122  (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3806289  (SCHWARZ E) [A] 1-16 * column W *