EP0982965 - Method for establishing session key agreement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Patel, Sarvar 34 Miller Lane Montville, New Jersey 07045 / US | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd Patent Business c/o Nokia 125 Finsbury Pavement London EC2A 1NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield EN3 7XU / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [2000/09] | Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr., et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99306473.2 | 17.08.1999 | [2000/09] | Priority number, date | US19980141580 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: US 141580 | [2000/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0982965 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0982965 | Date: | 20.12.2000 | [2000/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0982965 | Date: | 10.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/06 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04L9/14 (KR);
H04L63/0869 (EP,US);
H04W12/041 (EP,US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/09] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2001/36] |
Former [2000/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Etablierung eines einheitlichen Session Keys | [2000/09] | English: | Method for establishing session key agreement | [2000/09] | French: | Méthode pour l'établissement d'un accord de clé de session | [2000/09] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 10.08.2011 | SE | 10.08.2011 | [2012/10] |
Former [2012/09] | FI | 10.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY] - PARK CH -S, "ON CERTIFICATE-BASED SECURITY PROTOCOLS FOR WIRELESS MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19970901), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 50 - 55, XP000699941 [X] 1,4,7,11,18-20,25,26 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,6,8-10,14-17,24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.620522 | [Y] - BROWN D, "TECHNIQUES FOR PRIVACY AND AUTHENTICATION IN PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONSYSTEMS A WELL DESIGNED P&A TECHNIQUE IS NEVASSARY TO PROTECT ASSETS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, (19950801), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 6 - 10, XP000517584 [Y] 2,3,5,6,8-10,14-17,24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/98.403452 | [A] - AZIZ A ET AL, "PRIVACY AND AUTHENTICATION FOR WIRELESS LOCAL AREA NETWORKS A SECURE COMMUNICATIONS PROTOCOL TO PREVENT UNAUTHORIZED ACCESS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, (19940331), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1070-9916, pages 25 - 31, XP000460718 [A] 1,4,8,9,11,18-20,25,26 * page 25, line 1 - page 27, line 82 * | by applicant | - "ON CERTIFICATE-BASED SECURITY PROTOCOLS FOR WIRELESS MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS", PARK CH-S, IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, US, IEEE INC., (19970901), vol. 11, pages 50 - 55 | - BROWN D, "TECHNIQUES FOR PRIVACY AND AUTHENTICATION IN PERSONAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS A WELL DESIGNED P&A TECHNIQUE IS NECESSARY TO PROTECT ASSETS", IEEE PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, US, IEEE COMMUNICATION SOCIETY, (19950801), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 6 - 10 | - CHANG-SEOP PARK, "On Certificate-Based Security Protocols for Wireless Mobile Communication Systems", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, (19970901), vol. II, no. 5 |