Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980680

EP0980680 - Ophthalmic treatment apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.05.2005
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kowa Company, Ltd.
Nishiki 3-6-29, Naka-ku
Nagoya-City, Aichi 460-8625 / JP
For all designated states
HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K.K.
1126-1 Ichino-cho
Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP
For all designated states
Obana, Akira
Myojin 3-2-5, Oji-cho Kitakatsuragi-gun
Nara 636-0022 / JP
For all designated states
Miki, Tokuhiko
Akasakadai 5-11-12 Sakai City
Osaka 590-0144 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/29]For all designated states
Kowa Company Ltd.
Nishiki 3-6-29, Naka-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi 460-8625 / JP
For all designated states
Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1, Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP
For all designated states
Obana, Akira
Myojin 3-2-5, Oji-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 636-0022 / JP
For all designated states
Miki, Tokuhiko
Akasakadai 5-11-12
Sakai City, Osaka 590-0144 / JP
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Kowa Company Ltd.
Nishiki 3-6-29, Naka-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi 460-8625 / JP
For all designated states
Hamamatsu Photonics K.K.
1126-1, Ichino-cho, Hamamatsu-shi
Shizuoka-ken 435-8558 / JP
For all designated states
Obana, Akira
Myojin 3-2-5, Oji-cho
Kitakatsuragi-gun, Nara 636-0022 / JP
For all designated states
Miki, Tokuhiko
Akasakadai 5-11-12
Sakai City, Osaka 590-0144 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hirano, Toru, c/o Hamamatsu Photonics KK
Ichino-cho 1126-1, Hamamatsu City
Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
02 / Sakamoto, Shigeru, c/o Hamamatsu Photonics KK
Ichino-cho 1126-1, Hamamatsu City
Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP
03 / Kobayashi, Koji
c/o Kowa Company Ltd., Shinmiyakoda 1-3-1
Hamamatsu City, Shizuoka 431-2103 / JP
04 / Niwa, Hideaki
c/o Kowa Company Ltd., Chofugaoka 3-3-1
Chofu City, Tokyo 182-0021 / JP
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date99306483.117.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateJP1998023366020.08.1998         Original published format: JP 23366098
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980680
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0980680
Date:14.07.2004
Language:EN
[2004/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61F9/008, A61B3/12, A61B5/00
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/08]
TitleGerman:Augenbehandlungsgerät[2000/08]
English:Ophthalmic treatment apparatus[2000/08]
French:Appareil pour le traitement ophtalmique[2000/08]
Examination procedure17.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
29.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.03.2004Fee for grant paid
09.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
01.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
CY14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
IE17.08.2004
LU17.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
PT14.12.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
CY14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
IE17.08.2004
LU17.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2006/24]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
NL14.07.2004
IE17.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/46]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
IE17.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/28]AT14.07.2004
BE14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
ES25.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
DK14.10.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/21]AT14.07.2004
CH14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
LI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/18]AT14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
GR14.10.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/13]AT14.07.2004
FI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/11]FI14.07.2004
SE14.10.2004
Former [2005/10]SE14.10.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9822016  (VELDE FRANS J VAN DE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 12, paragraph 1 * * page 20, line 1 - line 15 *;
 [Y]EP0791361  (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * page 6, line 53 - line 57 *;
 [YA]DE3638226  (RODENSTOCK INSTR [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 7, line 30 - line 40 * [A] 5;
 [YA]US4213678  (POMERANTZEFF OLEG [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 3, line 53 - line 60; figure 1 * * column 8, line 54 - line 65 * [A] 1;
 [A]US5279298  (FLOWER ROBERT W [US]) [A] 1,3 * column 4, line 67 - column 5, line 31; figure 2 * * column 6, line 3 - line 24 *;
 [A]US5707986  (MILLER JOAN W [US], et al) [A] 8 * column 4, line 11 - line 28 *
by applicantJPH09173376