Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0983876

EP0983876 - Pneumatic radial tires [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ogawa, Yuichiro
15-1, Katamachi 2-chome
Fuchu City, Tokyo / JP
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Whalley, Kevin
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Whalley, Kevin
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date99306492.217.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998024682001.09.1998         Original published format: JP 24682098
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0983876
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0983876
Date:02.05.2001
[2001/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0983876
Date:19.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.03.2001
ClassificationInternational:B60C15/05, B60C9/02, B60C15/00
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2002/04]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Radiale Luftreifen[2000/10]
English:Pneumatic radial tires[2000/10]
French:Bandages pneumatiques[2000/10]
Examination procedure21.06.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
06.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.06.2005Fee for grant paid
29.06.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0778161  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-9 * page 4, line 6 - line 30 * * page 5, line 12 - line 49; figures 4-6,9A-11B,15 * [A] 5;
 [X]GB2179009  (APSLEY METALS LTD) [X] 1-4 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]GB393312  (INDIA RUBBER GUTTA PERCHA TELE, et al) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]EP0664231  (SEDEPRO [FR]);
 [A]GB172784  (DUNLOP RUBBER CO, et al) [A] 5 * figure - *
by applicantJPH06171306
 JPH09155991