Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0980957

EP0980957 - Composition for sealing pipe in well bore [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.09.2003  [2003/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (a Delaware corp.)
P.O. Drawer 1431
Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. (a Delaware corp.)
P.O. Drawer 1431
Duncan, Oklahoma 73536 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chatterji, Jiten
2213 Scott Lane
Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US
02 / Cromwell, Roger S.
128 East Nevada
Walters, Oklahoma 73572 / US
03 / Onan, David D.
3218 Lansbrook Court
Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US
04 / King, Bobby J.
Route 1, Box 16V
Duncan, Oklahoma 73533 / US
[2000/08]
Representative(s)Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London
WC1V 7LE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/08]Wain, Christopher Paul , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99306504.418.08.1999
[2000/08]
Priority number, dateUS1998013599818.08.1998         Original published format: US 135998
[2000/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0980957
Date:23.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:E21B33/16, C04B24/26
[2000/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/45]
Former [2000/08]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzung zum Zementieren von Rohrsträngen in Bohrlöchern[2000/08]
English:Composition for sealing pipe in well bore[2000/08]
French:Composition pour sceller des tubes dans des puits de forage[2000/08]
Examination procedure23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/20]
01.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/37]
11.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200204   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0619414  (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [Y] 1-5,7,9 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 2 * * column 8, line 42 - column 11, line 5 * * column 15, line 52 - column 16, line 20 *;
 [Y]US5688844  (CHATTERJI JITEN [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 27 * * column 3, line 38 - line 46 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 15 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 19 *;
 [Y]GB2247234  (HALLIBURTON CO [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-9 * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 35 * * page 8, line 3 - line 8 * * page 10, line 19 - line 22 * * page 13, line 10 - line 13 *;
 [Y]US5037868  (SAITO MASAYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,6 * column 1, line 21 - column 2, line 42 *;
 [Y]JPH01275454
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900126), vol. 014, no. 043, Database accession no. (C - 0681), [Y] 1-3,6,7 * abstract *