Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996067

EP0996067 - Method of recognition of a device connection state and processing unit having function of such recognition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2007
Database last updated on 08.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2006/13]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kawasaki, Yusuke, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Hashimoto, Shigeru, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Koken, c/o Fujitsu Limited
1-1 Kamikodanaka, 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London
WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Hitching, Peter Matthew , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99306609.120.08.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998030149922.10.1998         Original published format: JP 30149998
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0996067
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0996067
Date:28.01.2004
[2004/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996067
Date:29.03.2006
Language:EN
[2006/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.12.2003
ClassificationInternational:G06F13/42, G06F13/40
[2004/05]
Former International [2000/17]G06F13/42
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/43]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Gerätverbindungszustandserkennung und Verarbeitungseinheit mit Funktion einer derartigen Erkennung[2000/17]
English:Method of recognition of a device connection state and processing unit having function of such recognition[2000/17]
French:Méthode de reconnaissance d'état de connexion d'un dispositif et unité de traitement avec une function d'une telle reconnaissance[2000/17]
Examination procedure12.03.2004Examination requested  [2004/20]
27.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2006Fee for grant paid
23.01.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.01.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US4348670  (DESHON WALLACE E) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 38 - line 59 * * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 12 * * column A; figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5469554  (TUCKER BRIAN B [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 12 * * column A; figure 2 *;
 [A]US5600271  (ERICKSON CHARLES R [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column A *