Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984554

EP0984554 - Automatic gain and phase controller [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/10]Feed forward amplifier improvement incorporating an automatic gain and phase controller
[2008/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.12.2009
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Myer, Robert Evan
30 Spear Lane
Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Patent Business
c/o Nokia
125 Finsbury Pavement
London EC2A 1NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2005/25]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2000/10]Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99306643.023.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateUS1998014424531.08.1998         Original published format: US 144245
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984554
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984554
Date:24.10.2001
[2001/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984554
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2001
ClassificationInternational:H03F1/32
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FI,   FR,   GB,   SE [2002/29]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Automatische Verstärkungs- und Phasenregelschaltung[2008/39]
English:Automatic gain and phase controller[2008/37]
French:Circuit de commande automatique du gain et de la phase automatique[2008/37]
Former [2000/10]Verbesserung bei vorwärtsgekoppelten Verstärkern mit einer Verstärkungs- und Phaseregelschaltung
Former [2000/10]Feed forward amplifier improvement incorporating an automatic gain and phase controller
Former [2000/10]Perfectionnement apporté à un amplificateur à boucle de contre-réaction de type aval, comprenant un circuit de commande automatique du gain et de la phase automatique
Examination procedure12.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/25]
28.07.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2008Fee for grant paid
24.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
16.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
22.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
21.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
19.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI18.02.2009
SE18.05.2009
[2010/06]
Documents cited:Search[XYA]US5742201  (EISENBERG JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 8, line 28 - column 9, line 1; figures 4,18 * * column 12, line 54 - column 13, line 19 * [Y] 14 [A] 2-8,10-13;
 [Y]US5157345  (KENINGTON PETER B [GB], et al) [Y] 14 * figure 2 *;
 [A]FR2532491  (THOMSON CSF [FR]);
 [A]US4916407  (OLVER TERENCE E [US])