Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1081043

EP1081043 - Manufacture and assembly of structures [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.06.2001
Database last updated on 25.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.07.2001 [2001/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
For all designated states
ADVANCED COMPOSITES GROUP LTD.
Composites House, Delves Road, Heanor Gate Inudstrial Estate Heanor
Derbys DE7 7SJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]For all designated states
BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY
Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
For all designated states
Advanced Composites Group Ltd.
Composites House, Delves Road, Heanor Gate Inudstrial Estate
Heanor, Derbys DE7 7SJ / GB
Representative(s)Eastmond, John , et al
British Aerospace plc, Corporate IPR Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/10]Eastmond, John , et al
British Aerospace plc, Corporate IPR Department, Lancaster House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
Application number, filing date99306661.223.08.1999
[2001/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1081043
Date:07.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:B64C1/12
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Herstellung und Montage von Strukturen[2001/10]
English:Manufacture and assembly of structures[2001/10]
French:Fabrication et assemblage des structures[2001/10]
Examination procedure28.12.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/29]
05.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5)  [2001/29]
Documents cited:Search[X]US3609116  (THOMAS JACK E, et al) [X] 1-10 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 46 *;
 [A]US4478915  (POSS ELIASZ [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [A]US4861643  (SCOLLARD CYNTHIA M [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *