Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989187

EP0989187 - Microbial biotransformation using microorganisms of the genus Monosporium or Thamostylum [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2008
Database last updated on 23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.04.2009  [2009/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, CT 06340 / US
[2007/49]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
Pfizer Products Inc.
Eastern Point Road
Groton, Connecticut 06340 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Truesdell, Susan Jane
40 Metcalf Street
Warwick, Rhode Island 02888 / US
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Simpson, Alison Elizabeth Fraser , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date99306750.325.08.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateUS19980098255P28.08.1998         Original published format: US 98255 P
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989187
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989187
Date:13.06.2001
[2001/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989187
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2001
ClassificationInternational:C12P17/10, C12P41/00
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/13]
TitleGerman:Mikrobielle Biotransformation unter Verwendung von Mikroorganismen der Gattung Monosporium oder Thamostylum[2000/13]
English:Microbial biotransformation using microorganisms of the genus Monosporium or Thamostylum[2000/13]
French:Biotransformation microbienne en utilisant des microorganismes du genre Monosporium ou Thamostylum[2000/13]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure03.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/13]
02.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.04.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
15.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.10.2007Fee for grant paid
18.10.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.09.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46]
Request for further processing for:15.05.2006Request for further processing filed
15.05.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.05.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
03.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
02.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
10.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
24.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipMC31.08.2008
[2009/18]
Documents cited:Search[A]  - SORBERA, L. A. ET AL, "CP-336156: treatment of osteoporosis", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 130:191316, URL: STN, XP002165660 [A] 1-6 * abstract *
    [] - DRUGS FUTURE (1998), 23(10), 1066-1070,
 [A]  - ROSATI, ROBERT L. ET AL, "Discovery and Preclinical Pharmacology of a Novel, Potent, Nonsteroidal Estrogen Receptor Agonist/Antagonist, CP-336156, a Diaryltetrahydronaphthalene", DATABASE CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 129:184100, URL: STN, XP002165661 [A] 1-6 * abstract *
    [] - J. MED. CHEM. (1998), 41(16), 2928-2931,