Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1004377

EP1004377 - Portable journal turning lathe [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricci, Donato L.
W8477 - 162nd Avenue Hager City
Wisconsin 54014 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]For all designated states
Ricci, Donato L.
W8477 - 162nd Avenue
Hager City, Wisconsin 54014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/22]
Representative(s)MacGregor, Gordon , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/22]MacGregor, Gordon , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99306764.425.08.1999
[2000/22]
Priority number, dateUS1998019775923.11.1998         Original published format: US 197759
[2000/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1004377
Date:31.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1004377
Date:29.01.2003
[2003/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1004377
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2002
ClassificationInternational:B23B5/08, B23Q9/00
[2003/04]
Former International [2000/22]B23B5/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
TitleGerman:Tragbare Drehmaschinen[2000/22]
English:Portable journal turning lathe[2000/22]
French:Tour portable[2000/22]
Examination procedure02.05.2003Examination requested  [2003/27]
27.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2004Fee for grant paid
26.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
CY23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
IE25.08.2004
LU25.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
PT23.11.2004
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
CY23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
IE25.08.2004
LU25.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
Former [2005/46]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
IE25.08.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
Former [2005/23]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
MC31.08.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
ES04.10.2004
Former [2005/22]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5660093  (RICCI DONATO L [US]) [DA] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4359917  (WILGER JOHN F, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *;
 [A]US4739685  (RICCI DONATO L [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract *