Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984390

EP0984390 - Apparatus for providing location information in a multidimensional address space [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Xerox Corporation
Xerox Square Rochester
New York 14644 / US
[2009/09]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
XEROX CORPORATION
Xerox Square
Rochester, New York 14644 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hecht, David L
2001 Barara Drive
Palo Alto, California 94303 / US
02 / Jared, David A.
622 E. McKinley Avenue
Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US
03 / Flores, L. Noah
2380 Rodeo Gulch Road
Soquel, California 95073 / US
04 / Stearnes, Richard G.
401 Blair Street
Felton, California 95018 / US
05 / Chang, Kenneth H.P.
1035 East Hillsdale Blvd, No. 218
Foster City, California 94404 / US
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Skone James, Robert Edmund
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99306875.827.08.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateUS1998014425131.08.1998         Original published format: US 144251
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0984390
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0984390
Date:10.01.2001
[2001/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984390
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:G06K19/06
[2008/42]
Former International [2001/02]G06K19/06, G06K11/08
Former International [2000/10]G06K19/06
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/39]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Angabe von Positionsinformationen in einem mehrdimensionalen Adressraum[2008/37]
English:Apparatus for providing location information in a multidimensional address space[2000/10]
French:Dispositif pour fournir des information de position dans une espace d'adresse multidimensionelle[2000/10]
Former [2000/10]Vorrichtung zur Ortungsinformationversorgung in einem mehrdimensionalen Adressraum
Examination procedure10.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
30.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2009Fee for grant paid
07.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
01.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[PX]US5937110  (PETRIE GLEN W [US], et al) [PX] 1,2 * column 8, paragraph L - column 9, paragraph 2; figure 15 *;
 [X]JPH10187911  (XEROX CORP) [X] 1,2;
 [X]EP0853271  (SEIKO INSTR INFORMATION DEVICE [JP]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US3891829  (DOBRAS BRUCE W) [A] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, paragraph L - column 3, paragraph 1 *;
 [A]US4260979  (SMITH ROBERT C) [A] 1,2 * column W *