Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993077

EP0993077 - Half-fitting prevention connector and method of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.10.2006  [2006/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/46]For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108 / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Fukuda, Masaru
c/o Yazaki Parts Co.,Ltd., 206-1 Nunobikibara
Haibara-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Brunner, Michael John
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Brunner, Michael John
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date99306983.002.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028282005.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28282098
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993077
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993077
Date:26.07.2000
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993077
Date:16.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/62, H01R13/629
[2000/30]
Former International [2000/15]H01R13/62
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/15]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbinder mit Verhinderung einer unvollständigen Kupplung und dessen Herstellungsverfahren[2000/15]
English:Half-fitting prevention connector and method of producing same[2000/15]
French:Connecteur pour empêcher une demi-connexion et son procédé de fabrication[2000/15]
Examination procedure02.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/48]
01.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2005Fee for grant paid
01.07.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19733893  (YAZAKI CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 6, line 26 - column 10, line 61 *;
 [A]EP0637102  (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 3, line 52 - column 5, line 54 *;
 [A]EP0583056  (FUJIKURA LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 9, line 6 - column 10, line 41 *;
 [A]US5718596  (INABA SHIGEMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * abstract * * column 3, line 66 - column 7, line 45 *