Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0984617

EP0984617 - Facsimile apparatus and information printing method of facsimile apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.06.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.08.2005  [2005/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545-8522 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sakai, Yoichi
3-19-11 Nanyodai
Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP
02 / Sugiyama, Masao
1-9-2 Nakase, Mihama-ku
Chiba-shi, Chiba / JP
[2000/10]
Representative(s)Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/10]Brown, Kenneth Richard , et al
R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date99306990.502.09.1999
[2000/10]
Priority number, dateJP1998024864302.09.1998         Original published format: JP 24864398
[2000/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0984617
Date:08.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0984617
Date:11.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP15.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32
[2000/10]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/47]
Former [2000/10]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Faksimilegerät und Verfahren zum Drucken von Informationen eines Faksimilegerätes[2000/10]
English:Facsimile apparatus and information printing method of facsimile apparatus[2000/10]
French:Télécopieur et procédé d'impression d'information d'un télécopieur[2004/03]
Former [2000/10]Telecopieur et procedé d'impression d'information d'un telecopieur
Examination procedure24.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
09.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.09.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
20.11.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) PT
20.12.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2004Fee for grant paid
09.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
11.10.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
11.10.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YA]US4862254  (TAKADA TOSHIYUKI [JP]) [Y] 1,6,11 * abstract * * column 6, line 35 - line 54 * [A] 2-5,7-10,12;
 [YA]GB2307824  (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,6,11 * abstract * * page 4, line 24 - line 27 * [A] 2-5,7-10,12;
 [A]DE19602129  (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5440408  (TOMITA KAN [JP]) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [AD]JPH04270548
 [AD]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930209), vol. 017, no. 065, Database accession no. (E - 1317), [AD] 1-12 * abstract *