Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989327

EP0989327 - Hydraulic tensioner with external rack having backlash restriction [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 10.09.2008  [2008/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BorgWarner, Inc.
Powertrain Technical Center 3800 Automation Drive Suite 100
Auburn Hills MI 48326-1782 / US
[2008/37]
Former [2003/04]For all designated states
BorgWarner Inc.
Powertrain Technical Center 3800 Automation Avenue
Auburn Hills, MI 48326-1782 / US
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
Borg-Warner Automotive, Inc.
3001 West Big Beaver Road, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5060
Troy, Michigan 48007-5060 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Preston, Todd K.
436 Meadowbriar Road
Rochester, NY 14616 / US
02 / Simpson, Roger T.
29 Woodlane Road
Ithaca, NY 14850 / US
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Hedges, Martin Nicholas , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co.
10 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7NG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Hedges, Martin Nicholas , et al
A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn
London WC1V 7LE / GB
Application number, filing date99307056.406.09.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateUS19980101260P21.09.1998         Original published format: US 101260 P
US1999023178315.01.1999         Original published format: US 231783
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989327
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989327
Date:17.05.2000
[2000/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989327
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:F16H7/08
[2000/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2001/05]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Hydraulische Spannvorrichtung mit externem Klinkenwerk mit Spielbeschränkung[2000/13]
English:Hydraulic tensioner with external rack having backlash restriction[2000/13]
French:Tendeur hydraulique avec verrouillage à cliquet externe avec limitation de jeu[2000/13]
Examination procedure23.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/51]
21.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.12.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
21.10.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1}
05.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2003Fee for grant paid
07.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Request for further processing for:22.11.2002Request for further processing filed
22.11.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.12.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
05.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0106325  (WINKELHOFER & SOEHNE JOH [DE]) [Y] 1,5 * figures 29,45 *;
 [Y]US5346436  (HUNTER FRANCIS J [US], et al) [Y] 1,5 * figure - *;
 [A]US3081643  (AUGUST HUBOI CARL, et al) [A] 2,3 * figure - *