Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021060

EP1021060 - High speed weighted fair queuing system for ATM switches [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, NJ 07974-0636 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2009/12]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC.
600 Mountain Avenue
Murray Hill, New Jersey 07974-0636 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Chien
38 Karyn Terrace
West Middletown, New Jersey 07748 / US
02 / He, Linhai
12 Old Flint Circle, Hockessin, DL 19707
Eatontown, Monmouth, New Jersey NJ 07724 / US
03 / Wong, Albert Kai-sun
49 Richard Road
Edison, New Jersey 08820 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Ltd
Intellectual Property Business Group
Christchurch Way
Greenwich
London SE10 0AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/46]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Alcatel-Lucent Telecom Limited Unit 18, Core 3, Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield
EN3 7XU / GB
Former [2006/09]Sarup, David Alexander , et al
Lucent Technologie NS UK Limited 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB
Former [2000/29]Watts, Christopher Malcolm Kelway, Dr. , et al
Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road
Woodford Green Essex, IG8 0TU / GB
Application number, filing date99307086.107.09.1999
[2000/29]
Priority number, dateUS1998015335215.09.1998         Original published format: US 153352
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021060
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
[2000/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1021060
Date:02.01.2003
[2003/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021060
Date:18.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.11.2002
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/56
[2008/46]
Former International [2000/29]H04Q11/04
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2003/39]
Former [2000/29]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:System mit gewichteten gerechten Warteschlangen mit hoher Geschwindigkeit für ATM Vermittlungstellen[2000/29]
English:High speed weighted fair queuing system for ATM switches[2000/29]
French:Système pondéré de mise en file d'attente équitable à haute vitesse pour des commutateurs ATM[2000/29]
Examination procedure20.06.2003Examination requested  [2003/34]
18.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.12.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2008Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.10.2008
22.09.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
07.10.2008Date of oral proceedings
07.10.2008Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
21.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2009Fee for grant paid
30.01.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
26.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
17.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
22.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
13.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.03.2009
[2011/28]
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - CHIUSSI ET AL, "IMPLEMENTING FAIR QUEUEING IN ATM SWITCHES: THE DISCRETE-RATE APPROACH", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE INFOCOM '98. THE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS. 17TH ANNUAL JOINT CONFERENCE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY. GATEWAY TO THE 21ST CENTURY. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, MARCH 29 - APRIL 2, 1998, PROCEEDINGS IEEE I, (19980329), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-4384-0, pages 272 - 281, XP000854202 [X] 1,2,4-10 * column A * * page 272, column L, paragraph 3 - page 273, column L, paragraph 3 * * page 275, column L, paragraph 3 - page 276, column R, paragraph 6 * * page 277, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 5 * [Y] 3

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INFCOM.1998.659663
 [A]  - BENNET J C R ET AL, "HIERARCHICAL PACKET FAIR QUEUEING ALGORITHMS", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19971001), vol. 5, no. 5, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 675 - 689, XP000722138 [A] 1,2,4-10 * figure 1 * * page 675, column L, paragraph 4 - page 676, column L, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/90.649568
 [YA]  - SHIMONISHI H ET AL, "PERFORMANCE ANALYSIS OF WEIGHTED ROUND ROBIN CELL SCHEDULING AND ITS IMPROVEMENT IN ATM NETWORKS", IEICE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRONICS INFORMATION AND COMM. ENG. TOKYO, JP, (19980501), vol. E81-B, no. 5, ISSN 0916-8516, pages 910 - 918, XP000779497 [Y] 3 * page 910, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 2 * * page 911, column L, paragraph 3 - column R, paragraph 2 * [A] 1,2,4-10
 [A]  - CHIUSSI F M ET AL, "Implementing fair queueing in ATM switches. II. The logarithmic calendar queue", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 1997. GLOBECOM '97., IEEE PHOENIX, AZ, USA 3-8 NOV. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971103), ISBN 0-7803-4198-8, pages 519 - 525, XP010254657 [A] 7 * page 519, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 520, column R, paragraph 5 - page 521, column L, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.1997.632599
 [A]  - ERMEDAHL A ET AL, "Response-time guarantees in ATM networks", REAL-TIME SYSTEMS SYMPOSIUM, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., THE 18TH IEEE SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 2-5 DEC. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971202), ISBN 0-8186-8268-X, pages 274 - 284, XP010260397 [A] 1,2,4-10 * page 276, column L, paragraph 3 - paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/REAL.1997.641289
 [A]  - MEI-HWEY HOU ET AL, "Service disciplines for guaranteed performance service", REAL-TIME COMPUTING SYSTEMS AND APPLICATIONS, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., FOURTH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN 27-29 OCT. 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19971027), ISBN 0-8186-8073-3, pages 244 - 250, XP010251834 [A] 1,2,4-10 * page 247 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RTCSA.1997.629230