Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0985395

EP0985395 - Sanitary napkin [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.10.2010
Database last updated on 23.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.11.2010  [2010/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime-ken / JP
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Uni-Charm Corporation
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP
Former [2000/11]For all designated states
UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho
Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Mizutani, Satoshi, c/o Technical Center
1531-7 Takasuka, Wadahama, Toyohama-cho
Mitoyo-gun, Kagawa-ken 769-1602 / JP
[2000/11]
Representative(s)Fitchett, Stuart Paul
Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford
WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2005/32]Fitchett, Stuart Paul
Saunders & Dolleymore European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford WD18 0JU / GB
Former [2000/11]Parry, Christopher Stephen
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Herts. WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date99307133.108.09.1999
[2000/11]
Priority number, dateJP1998025797711.09.1998         Original published format: JP 25797798
[2000/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0985395
Date:15.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/11]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0985395
Date:02.01.2002
[2002/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0985395
Date:09.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2000/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2002/38]
Former [2000/11]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Damenbinde[2000/11]
English:Sanitary napkin[2000/11]
French:Serviette hygiénique[2000/11]
Examination procedure28.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/35]
15.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
02.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.10.2009Fee for grant paid
27.10.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.09.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
01.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
26.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
05.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL09.12.2009
[2010/44]
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0904755  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [PX] 1 * the whole document *;
 [X]WO9707763  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5674341  (NG ANTHONY C [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 52 - line 67 * * column 4, line 38 - line 50; figure - *;
 [A]EP0769284  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 26; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US3575174  (MOGOR ERNEST) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9517148  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantEP0769284
 US3575174