EP0985948 - Optical waveguide element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Pref. 467-8530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-City, Aichi Prefecture 467-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Minakata, Makoto Godoshukusha 5-52, 22-6, Hirosawa 1-Chome Hamamatsu City, Shizuoka Pref. / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Jungo 15-109, Hirokute, Ukigai, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi Pref. / JP | 03 /
Hirai, Takami 37-18, Higashiyama, Miyoshi, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Imaeda, Minoru Furora Chiyoda 701, 20-24, Chiyoda 4-chome, Nakaku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/11] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99307195.0 | 10.09.1999 | [2000/11] | Priority number, date | JP19980258292 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25829298 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0985948 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/035, G02B6/122, G02F1/225 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
G02F1/035 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/48] |
Former [2000/11] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Wellenleiter-Element | [2000/11] | English: | Optical waveguide element | [2000/11] | French: | Elément à guide d'ondes optiques | [2000/11] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 22.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/47] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4387343 (KONDO MICHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1,5; | [Y]EP0413568 (OPTICAL MEASUREMENT TECHNOLOGY [JP]) [Y] 1-5; | [A]US5313535 (WILLIAMS GARETH F [US]) [A] 1; | [Y]EP0828175 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, Derwent World Patents Index, XP002900756 [A] 1,3-5 |