Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0987121

EP0987121 - Polymer-based laminates and marking method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/12]Apparatus and method of marking polymer-based laminates
[2004/27]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.12.2005
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip21.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 23.04.2008  [2008/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Agra Vadeko Inc.
2902 South Sheridan Way, Suite 103 Oakville
Ontario L6J 7L6 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]For all designated states
Agra Vadeko Inc.
2902 South Sheridan Way, Suite 103
Oakville, Ontario L6J 7L6 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Caporaletti, Omar
2927 Hammond Road
Mississauga, Ontario L5K 2M5 / CA
02 / Stoev, Nikolay
2 Ravenwood Place
Toronto, Ontario M4B 2M4 / CA
[2000/12]
Representative(s)Lyons, Andrew John , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Tower Building Water Street Liverpool
L3 1BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/12]Lyons, Andrew John , et al
ROYSTONS, Tower Building, Water Street
Liverpool L3 1BA, Merseyside / GB
Application number, filing date99307198.413.09.1999
[2000/12]
Priority number, dateGB1998002013716.09.1998         Original published format: GB 9820137
[2000/12]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0987121
Date:22.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/12]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0987121
Date:31.05.2000
[2000/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0987121
Date:09.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.04.2000
ClassificationInternational:B41M5/26, B41M3/14
[2000/12]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/12]
TitleGerman:Laminate auf Polymerbasis und Verfahren zu ihrem Markieren[2004/27]
English:Polymer-based laminates and marking method therefor[2004/27]
French:Laminés à base de polymères et procédé pour leur marquage[2004/27]
Former [2000/12]Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Markieren von Laminaten auf Polymerbasis
Former [2000/12]Apparatus and method of marking polymer-based laminates
Former [2000/12]Appareil et procédé pour le marquage de laminés à base de polymères
Examination procedure05.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
22.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.12.2004Fee for grant paid
09.12.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
PT09.07.2005
CY13.09.2005
IE13.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
[2008/17]
Former [2007/21]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
CY13.09.2005
IE13.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/40]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
IE13.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/30]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
MC30.09.2005
Former [2006/22]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
NL09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
Former [2006/14]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
GR09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
Former [2006/12]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
DK09.05.2005
SE09.05.2005
ES20.05.2005
Former [2005/51]AT09.02.2005
BE09.02.2005
FI09.02.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2005/48]FI09.02.2005
SE09.05.2005
Former [2005/46]FI09.02.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19630478  (QUARZWERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,6,12,13 * example 1 * * column 3, line 47 - line 51 * * column 5, line 25 - line 27 * * claims 1,2,8 *;
 [A]EP0710570  (QUANTUM CHEM CORP [US]) [A] 1-7,12-14 * page 2, line 25 - line 30 * * page 2, line 48 - line 51 * * page 3, line 25 - line 33 * * examples 18,19; table 6 *;
 [A]WO9534623  (KAO CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,12-14 * page 11, line 37 - page 12, line 20 * * example - * * claim 1 *;
 [AP]DE19732306  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [AP] 1-7,12-14 * figure 3; claim 1 *