Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003017

EP1003017 - Apparatus and method for presenting navigation information based on instructions described in a script [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 19.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2008No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.06.2008  [2008/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/28]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Sekiguchi, Minoru
Fujitsu L., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
02 / Naito, Hirohisa
Fujitsu L., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
03 / Horai, Hisayuki
Fujitsu L., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
04 / Maeda, Yoshiharu
Fujitsu L., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
05 / Takayama, Kuniharu
Fujitsu L., 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Stebbing, Timothy Charles , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date99307281.814.09.1999
[2000/21]
Priority number, dateJP1998033096020.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33096098
JP1999011319121.04.1999         Original published format: JP 11319199
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1003017
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1003017
Date:11.10.2000
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1003017
Date:11.07.2007
Language:EN
[2007/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:G08G1/0968, G01C21/34
[2000/41]
Former International [2000/21]G01C21/26, G08G1/0968
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2001/26]
Former [2000/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Gerät und Verfahren zur Anzeige von Navigationsinformationen, basierend auf in einer Liste beschriebenen Instruktionen[2000/21]
English:Apparatus and method for presenting navigation information based on instructions described in a script[2000/21]
French:Appareil et méthode de présentation d'informations de navigation basées sur des instructions décrites dans un scripte[2000/21]
Examination procedure30.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
17.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.05.2007Fee for grant paid
29.05.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05008320.3  / EP1569184
EP05024210.6  / EP1628277
Opposition(s)14.04.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
28.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0867850  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [A]WO9851991  (SNAP ON TECH INC [US]);
 [A]JPH09153054  ;
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09153054 A 19970610 (NEC CORP) [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PECK A ET AL, "Junction detection and pathway selection", MOBILE ROBOTS VI, BOSTON, MA, USA, 14-15 NOV. 1991, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1992, USA, vol. 1613, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 139 - 145, XP000934065

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.135173
 [A]  - LIM W ET AL, "Plan-behavior interaction in autonomous navigation", MOBILE ROBOTS V, BOSTON, MA, USA, 8-9 NOV. 1990, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1991, USA, vol. 1388, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 464 - 475, XP000934064

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.48097