Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991003

EP0991003 - Method and apparatus for compiling a retail survey with a retail terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.07.2003  [2003/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton
Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dejaeger, Wilfried
315 Hurst Bourne Lane
Duluth, Georgia 30097 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Cleary, Fidelma , et al
NCR Limited
International Patent Department
206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Cleary, Fidelma , et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date99307376.617.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateUS1998016409730.09.1998         Original published format: US 164097
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991003
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991003
Date:12.09.2001
[2001/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.07.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60
[2000/14]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/23]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erstellen einer Kundendaten-Marktübersicht mittels eines Verkaufsendgerätes[2000/14]
English:Method and apparatus for compiling a retail survey with a retail terminal[2000/14]
French:Procédé et appareil de compilation d'un sondage aupres de la clientèle du distributeur au moyens d'un terminal de vente[2000/14]
Examination procedure12.03.2002Examination requested  [2002/21]
08.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.01.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/31]
26.02.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4982346  (GIROUARD KENNETH P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,17-20 * column A * * page 66, column 4, line 25 - line 29 * [Y] 3,9-16;
 [Y]EP0811958  (NCR INT INC [US]) [Y] 3,9-16 * abstract * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5490060  (MALEC JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *;
 [A]US5592560  (DEATON DAVID W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *