Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992909

EP0992909 - Provision of continuous database service and scalable query performance using active redundant copies [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
01.09.2006New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
01.09.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard Dayton
Ohio 45479 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
NCR INTERNATIONAL INC.
1700 South Patterson Boulevard
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Robinson, Irving M.
11105 Papoose Court
San Diego CA 92127 / US
02 / ANTOUN, Selim Zoher
1241 Del Mar Heights Rd.
Del Mar, CA 92014 / US
03 / Dempster, Pataric B.
59 Pape Drive
Atlantic Highlands NJ 07716 / US
04 / MacDonald, Robert J.
14308 Bourgeois Way
San Diego CA 92129 / US
05 / Stellwagen Jr., Richard G.
13035 Camino Del Valle
Poway CA 92064 / US
06 / Blevins, Terence J.
1083 Highpoint Drive
Springboro OH 45066 / US
07 / Ramsey, David Allen
124 Belle Chase Drive
Lexington SC 29072 / US
[2000/40]
Former [2000/15]01 / Robinson, Irving M.
11105 Papoose Court
San Diego CA 92127 / US
02 / Antoun, Selim Zoher
8006 Los Sabalos Street
San Diego CA 92126 / US
03 / Dempster, Pataric B.
59 Pape Drive
Atlantic Highlands NJ 07716 / US
04 / MacDonald, Robert J.
14308 Bourgeois Way
San Diego CA 92129 / US
05 / Stellwagen Jr., Richard G.
13035 Camino Del Valle
Poway CA 92064 / US
06 / Blevins, Terence J.
1083 Highpoint Drive
Springboro OH 45066 / US
07 / Ramsey, David Allen
124 Belle Chase Drive
Lexington SC 29072 / US
Representative(s)Williamson, Brian , et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road London
NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/50]Williamson, Brian , et al
NCR Limited International Patent Department 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Former [2004/35]Williamson, Brian , et al
Barker Bretell 10-12 Priests Bridge
London SW15 5JE / GB
Former [2000/15]Cleary, Fidelma , et al
International IP Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date99307381.617.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS1998016370830.09.1998         Original published format: US 163708
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992909
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992909
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:G06F11/14
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2002/37]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bereitstellung von kontinuierlichen Datanbankdiensten und skalierbarer Suchleistung durch aktive redundante Kopien[2000/15]
English:Provision of continuous database service and scalable query performance using active redundant copies[2000/15]
French:Provision de service de base de données et performance d'interrogation échelonnable par l'usage des copies redondantes[2000/15]
Examination procedure19.06.2002Examination requested  [2002/34]
22.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
31.08.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/40]
31.08.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.09.2006
21.09.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Request for further processing for:04.07.2003Request for further processing filed
04.07.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.07.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]US5761500  (GALLANT JOHN K [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 37; figures 2A-2C *;
 [X]US4432057  (DANIELL THOMAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9826553  (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [PA]US5832225  (HACHERL DONALD JOSEPH [US], et al) [PA] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [A]  GARCIA-MOLINA H ET AL, "RELIABLE DISTRIBUTED DATABASE MANAGEMENT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (19870501), vol. 75, no. 5, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 601 - 620, XP000050672 [A] 1-20 * the whole document *