Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992250

EP0992250 - Superabsorbent cellulosic natural or synthetic fibers and webs treated with polyelectrolytes and superabsorbent products made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2001
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2001Change - withdrawalpublished on 02.01.2002  [2002/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GEORGIA-PACIFIC CORPORATION
133 Peachtree Street, N.E.
Atlanta, GA 30303 / US
[2001/47]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
FORT JAMES CORPORATION
1650 Lake Cook Road
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bouchette, Michael Paul
W4937 Spring Court
Sherwood, WI 54169 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Colmer, Stephen Gary , et al
Mathys & Squire 100 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8AL / GB
Application number, filing date99307413.720.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS1998015787721.09.1998         Original published format: US 157877
US1999039046007.09.1999         Original published format: US 390460
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992250
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992250
Date:19.12.2001
[2001/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/60, A61L15/22, A61L15/40
[2001/51]
Former International [2000/15]A61L15/60
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/15]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Mit Polyelektrolyt behandelte natürliche oder synthetische superabsorbierende Cellulosefaser und Vliesstoff und daraus hergestellte superabsorbierende Produkte[2000/15]
English:Superabsorbent cellulosic natural or synthetic fibers and webs treated with polyelectrolytes and superabsorbent products made therefrom[2000/15]
French:Fibres et nappes cellulosique naturelles ou sythétiques superabsorbantes traitées avec des polyélectrolytes et articles superabsorbants produits à partir de ces matériaux[2000/15]
Examination proceduredeletedDeletion: Application withdrawn by applicant  [2001/51]
16.10.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[DX]US5071681  (MANNING JAMES H [US], et al) [DX] 1-8,10-24 * example 1 * * claim - *;
 [X]US5246544  (HOLLENBERG DAVID H [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8,13-16,18-24 * column 2, line 20 - line 24 * * claim - *;
 [DX]US4888238  (KATZ LEON [US], et al) [DX] 1-6,11,13-16,18,21-24 * claim - *;
 [DA]US5126382  (HOLLENBERG DAVID H [US]) [DA] 1-6,8,11,13-16,18,22-24 * column 2, line 31 - line 47 * * claim - *