Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0993059
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.10.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
26.10.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.12.2001 [2001/50] |
10.10.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
21.09.2001 |
Change - inventor |
published on 07.11.2001 [2001/45] |
18.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
18.09.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.04.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.01.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
22.12.2000 |
First examination report |
|
15.12.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.11.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.01.2001 [2001/02] |
11.11.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
09.11.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
09.11.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85b EPC1973) |
|
10.03.2000 |
Publication of search report |
published on 26.04.2000 [2000/17] |
25.02.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.04.2000 [2000/15] |