Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993059

EP0993059 - Via filled interconnect for solid oxide fuel cells [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.2002
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.12.2002  [2002/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOFCo, L.P.
2425 South 900 West
Salt Lake City, Utah 84119 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Sofco
2425 South 900 West
Salt Lake City, Utah 84119 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Hartvigsen, Joseph Jay
1529 South 400 East
Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US
02 / Khandkar, Ashok Chandrashekhar
2116 S. Lakeline Drive
Salt Lake City, Utah 84109 / US
03 / Elangovan, Singaravelu
11562 South Dry Creek Road
Sandy, Utah 84094 / US
 [2001/45]
Former [2000/15]01 / Hartvigsen, Joseph Jay
1539 South 400 East
Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US
02 / Khandkar, Ashok Chandrashekhar
2116 S. Lakeline Drive
Salt Lake City, Utah 84109 / US
03 / Elangovan, Singaravelu
11562 South Dry Creek Road
Sandy, Utah 84094 / US
Representative(s)Flynn, Michael Joseph
William Jones
Willow Lane House
Willow Lane
Norwich NR2 1EU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Flynn, Michael Joseph
William Jones, Willow Lane House, Willow Lane
Norwich NR2 1EU / GB
Application number, filing date99307432.715.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateUS1998015395916.09.1998         Original published format: US 153959
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993059
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0993059
Date:26.04.2000
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993059
Date:12.12.2001
Language:EN
[2001/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/02, H01M8/24
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   LI,   NL [2001/02]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verbundleiterplatte mit verfüllten Durchgangslöchern für Festelektrolyt-Brennstoffzellen[2000/15]
English:Via filled interconnect for solid oxide fuel cells[2000/15]
French:Interconnection à vias remplis pour piles à combustible à oxyde solide[2000/15]
Examination procedure31.10.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
20.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.09.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2001Fee for grant paid
24.09.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.09.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
31.10.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000
31.10.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000
31.10.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000
31.10.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
31.10.2000M01   Fee paid on   31.10.2000
Documents cited:Search[A]US5496655  (LESSING PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure 4 * * column 5, lines 19-57 * * column 9, line 60 - column 11, line 8 *;
 [A]US5279906  (YOSHIMURA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5342705  (MINH NGUYEN Q [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4, lines 15-44 *