Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1087192

EP1087192 - Reversible heat pump with sub-cooling receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.03.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.03.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.05.2005  [2005/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800
Syracuse, New York 13221 / US
[N/P]
Former [2001/13]For all designated states
CARRIER CORPORATION
Carrier Parkway P.O. Box 4800
Syracuse New York 13221 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Chavagnat, Hippolyte
235 chemin des Albanières
Montruel 01122 / FR
 [2001/13]
Representative(s)Leckey, David Herbert , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/17]Leckey, David Herbert , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2001/35]Powell, Timothy John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/13]Gilding, Martin John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date99307484.822.09.1999
[2001/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1087192
Date:28.03.2001
Language:EN
[2001/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1087192
Date:12.05.2004
Language:EN
[2004/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP09.03.2000
ClassificationInternational:F25B40/00
[2001/13]
Designated contracting statesDE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   NL,   SE [2004/20]
Former [2001/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Reversible Wärmepumpe mit einem Sammler zum Unterkühlen[2001/13]
English:Reversible heat pump with sub-cooling receiver[2001/13]
French:Pompe à chaleur réversible avec accumulateur de sous-refroidissement[2001/13]
Examination procedure06.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/23]
30.12.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.03.2004Fee for grant paid
12.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.02.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]US3938349  (UENO TAKEO) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 54; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4236381  (IMRAL SADIK S, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 50 - column 4, line 43; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5491981  (KIM JONG-YOUB [KR]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 34 - line 53; figure 3 *