blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0995592 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0995592



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 197
19.04.2006 Closing of application Search / examination 1
10.01.2006 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
10.01.2006 Communication concerning missing translation(s) of priority document(s) Search / examination 1
04.11.2005 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
20.07.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
20.07.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
20.07.2005 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
20.07.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 30
15.07.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.03.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
01.12.2003 Claims Search / examination 2
01.12.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
26.11.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 9
21.07.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
21.07.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
20.09.2002 Claims Search / examination 6
20.09.2002 Description Search / examination 7
20.09.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.09.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 23
26.07.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.07.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.04.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
12.04.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 6
28.06.2001 Claims Search / examination 5
28.06.2001 Description Search / examination 1
28.06.2001 Description Search / examination 2
28.06.2001 Description Search / examination 2
28.06.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.06.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 13
07.05.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
02.05.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.04.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
19.12.2000 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
19.12.2000 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.05.2000 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
24.01.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
22.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 5
22.09.1999 Description Search / examination 23
22.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7