blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0995592
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2000158614Global Dossier 13.06.2000A
Priority number Date
JP26485499 20.09.1999
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2000158613Global Dossier 13.06.2000A
Priority number Date
JP26485399 20.09.1999
JP26961298 24.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0995592Global Dossier 26.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2283349 24.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1198719C 27.04.2005C
CN1253074 17.05.2000A
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID23200 30.03.2000A
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100681362B 12.02.2007B1
KR20000023234 25.04.2000A
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY117196 31.05.2004A
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6319587 20.11.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP26961298 24.09.1998
JP27108698 25.09.1998