Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0995592

EP0995592 - Biaxially oriented polyester film [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Okazaki, Iwao
857-504, Jurakucho, Senbonnijosagaru, Kamigyo-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 802-8156 / JP
02 / Nakajima, Shozi
10-5, Sencho 2-chome
Otsu-shi, Shiga 520-0863 / JP
03 / Nakamori, Yukari
1497-14, Nagano, Shigarakicho
Koukagun, Shiga 529-1851 / JP
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Coleiro, Raymond , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Coleiro, Raymond , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date99307492.122.09.1999
[2000/17]
Priority number, dateJP1998026961224.09.1998         Original published format: JP 26961298
JP1998027108625.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27108698
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0995592
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:B32B27/36, B29C55/14, // G11B5/73
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2001/02]
Former [2000/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Biaxial orientierte Polyesterfolie[2000/17]
English:Biaxially oriented polyester film[2000/17]
French:Film en polyester étiré biaxialement[2000/17]
Examination procedure27.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
19.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
18.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/24]
10.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200507   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[E]EP0943428  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [E] 1-5,21-23,27,32 * page 6, line 41 - page 7, line 5 * * page 4, line 49 - page 17, line 53; examples 4-6,10-12; tables 2,3 *;
 [A]WO9732726  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,3-7,27 * page 33, line 16 - page 36, line 8; examples 122-124 * * page 60, line 14 - page 62, line 2; examples 250,251 *;
 [A]US5631124  (IKUHARA ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,27,32 * column 8, line 16 - column 10, line 43 * * column 13, line 32 - column 14, line 38; example 1; table 1 *;
 [A]US4489124  (WATANABE SEIZO [JP]) [A] 27,30,31 * column 5, line 62 - column 7, line 18; figure 7 * * claims 1,2 *