Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0989219

EP0989219 - Method of knitting inlaid fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/13]Method of knitting inlaid fabric and inlaid fabric knitted by the method
[2003/28]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.02.2005  [2005/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIMA SEIKI MANUFACTURING LIMITED
85 Sakata Wakayama
Wakayama / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]For all designated states
SHIMA SEIKI MANUFACTURING LIMITED
85 Sakata
Wakayama, Wakayama / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Shimasaki, Yoshinori
291-12 Ogura
Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP
[2000/13]
Representative(s)Jackson, Robert Patrick
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/13]Jackson, Robert Patrick
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99307587.827.09.1999
[2000/13]
Priority number, dateJP1998027139025.09.1998         Original published format: JP 27139098
[2000/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0989219
Date:29.03.2000
Language:EN
[2000/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0989219
Date:29.11.2000
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0989219
Date:18.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP18.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:D04B1/00, D04B1/18
[2000/48]
Former International [2000/13]D04B1/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2001/33]
Former [2000/13]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Stricken von einem Stoff mit eingelegten Schussfaden[2003/28]
English:Method of knitting inlaid fabric[2003/28]
French:Procédé de tricotage d'une étoffe à trames incorporées[2003/28]
Former [2000/13]Verfahren zum Stricken von einem Stoff mit eingelegten Schussfaden und nach diesem Verfahren gestrickter Stoff mit eingelegten Schussfaden
Former [2000/13]Method of knitting inlaid fabric and inlaid fabric knitted by the method
Former [2000/13]Procédé de tricotage d'une étoffe à trames incorporées et étoffe à trames incorporées tricotée selon ce procédé
Examination procedure19.03.2001Examination requested  [2001/20]
26.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2003Fee for grant paid
28.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0681045  (PROTECMA [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2069819  (HANS DIEM);
 [A]WO9100936  (COURTAULDS PLC [GB]);
 [A]DE908057  (MAX NEBEL)