Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991242

EP0991242 - Method and apparatus for caching credentials in proxy servers for wireless user agents [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  27.08.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.12.2009Change - representativepublished on 20.01.2010  [2010/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phone.Com Inc.
800 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Phone.Com, Inc.
800 Chesapeake Drive
Redwood City, CA 94063 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Liao, Hanqing
1025 Vista Pointe Circle
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
02 / King, Peter F.
121 Presidio Avenue
Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US
03 / Greer, Russell S.
244 Johnson Avenue
Losa Gatos, CA 95030 / US
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Suèr, Steven Johannes , et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London W1W 8AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/03]Suèr, Steven Johannes , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2000/14]Suèr, Steven Johannes , et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Application number, filing date99307615.728.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateUS1998016305029.09.1998         Original published format: US 163050
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991242
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0991242
Date:12.04.2000
[2000/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, H04L12/22, H04B7/26, H04L9/32
[2000/15]
Former International [2000/14]H04L29/06, H04L12/22
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/01]
Former [2000/52](deleted) 
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zwischenspeichern von Legalisierungsdaten in Proxy-Servers für drahtlose Teilnehmeragenten[2000/14]
English:Method and apparatus for caching credentials in proxy servers for wireless user agents[2000/14]
French:Méthode et appareil pour mettre en antémémoire des données d'authentification dans serveurs mandataires pour des agents d'utilisateur sans fil[2000/14]
Examination procedure12.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/01]
17.10.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US5586260  (HU WEI-MING [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * the whole document * [A] 6 [Y] 3;
 [A]US5673322  (HOVEY RICHARD REID [US], et al) [A] 6 * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 30; figure 5 *
 [YA]  - R. FIELDING ET AL., "Hypertext Transfer Protocol, HTTP/1.1", DATABASE INET, (19970101), URL: INTERNET: