Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992468

EP0992468 - Method for production of sintered lithium titaniumphosphate and sintered pellets obtained by the method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.10.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.12.2003  [2003/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Independent Administrative Institution
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology, Independent Administrative Institution
3-1, Kasumigaseki 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
Agency of Industrial Science & Technology, Ministry of International Trade & Industry (Japanese Government)
3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0013 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takeuchi, Tomonari
Koda 4-12-16, Ikeda
Osaka 563-0043 / JP
02 / Ado, Kazuaki
Kofudai 6-5-14, Toyono
Osaka 563-0104 / JP
03 / Tabuchi, Mitsuharu
Daiwacho 2-6, Okeda
Osaka 563-0054 / JP
04 / Kageyama, Hiroyuki
Hattorinishimachi 1-3-25, Toyonaka
Osaka 561-0858 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Smith, Norman Ian , et al
Cleveland
40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Smith, Norman Ian , et al
fJ CLEVELAND 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JQ / GB
Application number, filing date99307654.628.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998029601302.10.1998         Original published format: JP 29601398
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992468
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992468
Date:18.12.2002
Language:EN
[2002/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.01.2000
ClassificationInternational:C04B35/447, H01M6/18
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB [2000/52]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines gesinterten Lithiumtitanphosphats und danach erhaltene gesinterte Pellets[2000/15]
English:Method for production of sintered lithium titaniumphosphate and sintered pellets obtained by the method[2000/15]
French:Méthode de production de phosphate de titane et de lithium fritté et pastilles frittées obtenues par cette méthode[2000/15]
Examination procedure22.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
13.10.2000Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.01.2001Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
07.11.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
05.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2002Fee for grant paid
25.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US4985317  (ADACHI GINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * examples 26,27 *;
 [XP]  YO KOBAYASHI ET AL., J. POWER SOURCES, (1999), vol. 81, no. 6, pages 853 - 858, XP000086365 [XP] 1-24 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(89)90084-9
 [AD]  H. AONO ET AL., "Ionic Conductivity of Solid Electrolytes Based on Lithium Titanium Phosphate", J. OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, Manchester, (199004), vol. 137, no. 4, pages 1023 - 1027, XP000242164 [AD] 1-24 * the whole document *