Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0990852

EP0990852 - Burner apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.06.2001
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.08.2001 [2001/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Charlton & Jenrick Limited
Grate Ideas Centre, Castle Trading Estate Priorslee
Telford TF2 9NP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]For all designated states
Charlton & Jenrick Limited
Grate Ideas Centre, Castle Trading Estate
Priorslee, Telford TS2 9NP / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Charlton, Barry
Stokesay Way, Sutton Heights
Telford TF7 4QF / GB
[2000/14]
Representative(s)Swindell & Pearson Limited
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/14]Swindell & Pearson
48 Friar Gate
Derby DE1 1GY / GB
Application number, filing date99307655.328.09.1999
[2000/14]
Priority number, dateGB1998002129501.10.1998         Original published format: GB 9821295
[2000/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0990852
Date:05.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:F24C3/00, F24C15/00
[2000/14]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2000/51]
Former [2000/14]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Brennervorrichtung[2000/14]
English:Burner apparatus[2000/14]
French:Dispositif de brûleur[2000/14]
Examination procedure06.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/32]
08.02.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/32]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
15.11.2000AT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000BE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000CH   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000CY   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000DE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000DK   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000ES   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000FI   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000FR   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000GB   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000GR   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000IE   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000IT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000LU   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000MC   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000NL   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000PT   M01   Not yet paid
15.11.2000SE   M01   Not yet paid
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
15.11.2000M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3136309  (MARTZ ROGER G) [X] 1-9,11,15-22 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14;
 [Y]US4793322  (SHIMEK RONALD J [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * column 3, line 31 - line 50; figure 4 *;
 [A]US3628521  (HODGES RALPH R) [A] 1 * abstract *