blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0992210 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0992210



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 314
18.03.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
23.01.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
23.01.2006 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) Opposition 1
23.01.2006 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
29.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
18.10.2005 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.10.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
13.10.2005 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.10.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
07.10.2005 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 2
23.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.09.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
09.08.2005 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
29.07.2005 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
06.04.2005 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.03.2005 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.03.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 12
03.03.2005 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
03.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
03.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 39
03.03.2005 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.03.2005 Filing of a new opposition Opposition 99
22.04.2004 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.04.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
13.04.2004 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 13
13.04.2004 Request for change of address Search / examination 1
17.03.2004 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.03.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
17.03.2004 Translation of the claims Search / examination 1
22.12.2003 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
22.12.2003 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
22.12.2003 Text intended for grant Search / examination 14
09.07.2001 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.12.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.12.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
21.01.2000 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.12.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 2
09.12.1999 Invitation to file a duly signed covering letter Search / examination 2
03.11.1999 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.11.1999 Translation of priority document Search / examination 20
28.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 Description Search / examination 7
28.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 6
28.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6