blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0992210


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.01.2006 Revocation of patent published on  08.03.2006  [2006/10]
05.10.2005 New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked
04.08.2005 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
01.04.2005 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
11.03.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
11.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit
11.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: receipt of reply
11.03.2005 Opposition filed published on  27.04.2005  [2005/17]
08.03.2005 Unpublished change to opponent data
08.03.2005 Deletion: Examination of admissibility of opposition: despatch of communication + time limit
23.04.2004 Change - applicant published on  09.06.2004  [2004/24]
16.04.2004 (Expected) grant published on  02.06.2004  [2004/23]
31.01.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
31.01.2004 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
12.12.2003 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.10.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.09.2002 Renewal fee
03.01.2002 Change - extension states
31.08.2001 Definitive list of designations published on  17.10.2001 [2001/42]
14.08.2001 Renewal fee
20.07.2001 Request for examination filed published on  05.09.2001 [2001/36]
15.12.2000 Publication of search report published on  31.01.2001 [2001/05]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]