blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0992210
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP3730030BGlobal Dossier 21.12.2005B2
JP2000107071 18.04.2000A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP0992210Global Dossier 02.06.2004B1
EP0992210 31.01.2001A3
EP0992210 12.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU746977B 09.05.2002B2
AU5356599 13.04.2000A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR9904487 12.09.2000A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2282131 22.02.2005C
CA2282131 09.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1119114C 27.08.2003C
CN1250640 19.04.2000A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE69917727T 02.12.2004T2
DE69917727D 08.07.2004D1
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ID26002 16.11.2000A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100673361B 24.01.2007B1
KR20000028883 25.05.2000A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY122457 29.04.2006A
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG84548 20.11.2001A1
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW398268U 11.07.2000U
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US6299016 09.10.2001B1
Priority number Date
JP28767898 09.10.1998