blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0992210

Designated contracting states DE 
 FR 
 GB 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure19.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted02.06.2004
Opposition procedure17.10.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent published on 08.03.2006 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:12.04.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:31.01.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
 
Event date:31.01.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Free Format Text:AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI
 
Event date:05.09.2001 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20010706
 
Event date:17.10.2001 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Free Format Text:DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:02.06.2004 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):DE FR GB NL SE
 
Event date:02.06.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:09.06.2004 
Event description:RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
 
Event date:08.07.2004 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:69917727
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20040708
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:02.08.2004 
Event description:NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN
Owner Name:UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
 
Event date:14.09.2004 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:17.09.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20040917
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:27.09.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20040927
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:25.11.2004 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20041125
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:25.02.2005 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:27.04.2005 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
Effective DATE:20050302
 
Event date:01.07.2005 
Event description:NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO
Opponent Name:THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
 
Event date:22.07.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20050722
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:15.09.2005 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20050915
Year of Fee Payment:07
 
Event date:08.03.2006 
Event description:PATENT REVOKED
Effective DATE:20051017
 
Event date:08.03.2006 
Event description:GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE
Free Format Text:20051017
 
Event date:01.05.2006 
Event description:NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION
Effective DATE:20051017
 
Event date:01.08.2006 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE ECNC
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS BEEN REMOVED FROM THE REGISTER