Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992210

EP0992210 - Stacked body of wet sheets [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006Revocation of patentpublished on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun
Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi
Ehime 799-0111 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Uni-Charm Corporation
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-shi, Ehime-ken / JP
Former [2004/23]For all designated states
UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP
Former [2000/15]For all designated states
UNI-CHARM CORPORATION
182, Shimobun Kinsei-cho
Kawanoe-shi Ehime-ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Bando, Takeshi
Tech.Cent., 1531-7 Takasuka,Wadahama, Toyohama-cho
Mitoyo-gun, Kagawaw-ken 769-1602 / JP
02 / Tanaka, Yoshikazu
Tech.Cent., 1531-7 Takasuka,Wadahama, Toyohama-cho
Mitoyo-gun, Kagawaw-ken 769-1602 / JP
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Parry, Christopher Stephen
Saunders & Dolleymore
9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Herts. WD18 0JU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Parry, Christopher Stephen
Saunders & Dolleymore, 9 Rickmansworth Road
Watford, Herts. WD1 7HE / GB
Application number, filing date99307656.128.09.1999
[2000/15]
Priority number, dateJP1998028767809.10.1998         Original published format: JP 28767898
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0992210
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
[2000/15]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0992210
Date:31.01.2001
[2001/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0992210
Date:02.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47K10/42
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [2001/42]
Former [2000/15]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Stapel von feuchten Blättern[2000/15]
English:Stacked body of wet sheets[2000/15]
French:Empilement de feuilles humides[2000/15]
Examination procedure06.07.2001Examination requested  [2001/36]
22.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2004Fee for grant paid
19.01.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.03.2005  10.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2005/17]
Opponent(s)01  02.03.2005  10.03.2005  ADMISSIBLE
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Greene, Simon Kenneth
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
06.04.2005Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.10.2005Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
17.10.2005Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]US4638921  (SIGL WAYNE C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 46 * * column 5, line 42 - line 48; figures 2,6 *;
 [A]US3207360  (SCOTT DOUGLAS T) [A] 1 * column 3, line 55 - line 72; figure 3 *;
 [E]EP0983739  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2 * column 10, line 6 - line 23; figures 1A,5,6; claims 4,5 *;
 [PX]EP0879575  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PX] 1,2 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 23 * * column 12, line 9 - line 26; figures 1,2,4A *