blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0996115 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0996115



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 168
04.06.2008 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.07.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.06.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
19.06.2007 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.06.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
19.06.2007 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.06.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
10.04.2007 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 2
10.04.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.03.2007 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
23.02.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.02.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 36
27.12.2006 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
18.11.2004 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
04.11.2004 General enquiry Search / examination 1
11.06.2002 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2002 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
29.05.2002 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.04.2002 European search report Search / examination 2
29.11.2001 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
25.10.2001 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
15.03.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.02.2001 Request for change of name Search / examination 5
15.03.2000 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.09.1999 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.09.1999 Claims Search / examination 4
30.09.1999 Description Search / examination 23
30.09.1999 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.1999 Drawings Search / examination 9
30.09.1999 Priority document Search / examination 41
30.09.1999 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6